AMIT NALINKANT DALAL
-
About AMIT NALINKANT DALAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L17100MH1905PLC000200 PHOENIX MILLS LIMITED 306217980.0 Active 21/02/2007 - L17124RJ2005PLC020927 SUTLEJ TEXTILES AND INDUSTRIES LIMITED 163828620.0 Active 01/06/2006 - L29290MH1972PLC015772 MANUGRAPH INDIA LIMITED 60830000.0 Active 25/10/2005 - L67200MH1937PLC002622 TATA INVESTMENT CORPORATION LIMITED 550952960.0 Active 01/01/2015 - U40100MH1998PTC113861 SEW ENGINEERING (INDIA) PRIVATE LIMITED 38045200.0 Active 17/04/2008 - U51900MH1943PTC003894 ASHRU LATA AND CO PVT LTD 100000.0 Amalgamated 29/12/1986 - U65990WB1975PLC128186 H. L. INVESTMENT COMPANY LIMITED 26412780.0 Amalgamated 24/06/1991 - U67120MH1956PTC009825 DHIRAJLAL MAGANLAL PURSHOTAMDAS PVT LTD 128000.0 Amalgamated 05/12/1988 - U67120MH1983PLC031632 SIMTO INVESTMENT CO LTD 15298500.0 Active 31/08/2012 - U67120MH1997PTC111145 AMIT NALIN SECURITIES PRIVATE LIMITED 28900000.0 Active 07/10/1997 - U67190MH2005PLC153819 MILESTONE CAPITAL ADVISORS LIMITED 100000000.0 Active 17/09/2010 - U99999MH1995PTC086596 NEXGEN LIFIN PRIVATE LIMITED 108910.0 Active 28/03/1995 - -
Associated with Directors