ASHISH RAJENDRA BARWALE
-
About ASHISH RAJENDRA BARWALE,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01110MH1949PTC007795 DECCAN PLANTATIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 1030000.0 Active 22/08/2007 - U01110MH1978PTC020708 BARWALE SEEDS PRIVATE LIMITED 112000.0 Active 30/01/2017 - U15142MH1979PTC199022 LEADBETER SEEDS PVT LTD 2500000.0 Active 17/12/2014 - U29219MH1998PTC115973 DICKINSON FOWLER PRIVATE LIMITED 71000000.0 Active 25/06/2015 - U65990MH1990PTC055467 AKSHNISHIT INVESTMENT AND TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED 946300.0 Active 01/04/2017 - U65990MH1990PTC055468 JAMWADI INVESTMENT AND TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED 4411080.0 Active 23/03/2017 - U65990MH1990PTC055475 DUDHNA INVESTMENT AND TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED 2706000.0 Active 07/08/2017 - U65990MH1996PLC099431 GANGABISHAN BHIKULAL INVESTMENT AND TRADING LIMITED 36468640.0 Active 07/11/2008 - U65999MH1953PTC009189 JOHN FOWLER (INDIA) PRIVATE LIMITED 27298260.0 Amalgamated 22/04/2014 - U73100MH1987GAP042298 BARWALE FOUNDATION 0.0 Active 28/08/2014 - U74899MH1993PTC192449 SEVEN STAR FRUITS PRIVATE LIMITED 42828350.0 Active 11/02/2015 - U85100MH1995PTC094853 JOHN FOWLER OPHTHALMICS PRIVATE LIMITED 49632000.0 Active 21/03/2017 - U91990MH2005NPL153954 INDIAN FOUNDATION SEED AND SERVICES ASSOCIATION 0.0 Under Liquidation 14/03/2014 - -
Associated with Directors