ATANU SEN SHARMA
-
About ATANU SEN SHARMA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01409WB1986PTC040613 KASO AGRO PRODUCTS PVT. LTD. 9600000.0 Active 13/01/2004 - U15492WB1999PTC088820 OCTAL VIDYADHAR EXPORTS PRIVATE LIMITED 8303000.0 Active 12/01/2004 - U31501WB1994PTC064579 SUPERLITE ELECTRICALS PVT.LTD. 5635000.0 Active 01/01/2000 - U31909WB1992PTC055584 NULITE ELECTRICALS & FINANCE PVT LTD 5970000.0 Active 30/07/2004 - U51109WB1993PTC059244 TRIBENI BARTERS PVT. LTD. 5860200.0 Active 14/02/2009 - U63040WB1994PTC066151 AMBER TOURS & TRAVELS PVT. LTD. 8150000.0 Active 09/01/2004 - -
Associated with Directors
SOMIK ROY Director PRABIR KOYAL Director ASHISH TODI Director AMITABHA SARKAR Director