AJAYKUMAR PARMANAND KEJRIWAL
-
About AJAYKUMAR PARMANAND KEJRIWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U18101MH1980PTC023161 OMEGA KNITTERS PRIVATE LIMITED 2300000.0 Active 22/09/1980 - U55209MH2006PTC161066 PHOENIX HOSPITALITY COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 23214000.0 Active 27/06/2008 - U74999MH2008NPL185159 INTERNATIONAL WINE AND FOOD SOCIETY 0.0 Active 18/05/2015 - U99999MH1947PTC006018 RITZ PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 01/02/1996 - -
Associated with Directors