ANIL KUMAR GARG
-
About ANIL KUMAR GARG,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01111RJ2001PTC017153 LEE JEWELLERY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 07/06/2006 - U14102RJ1995PTC011133 QUEENS GRANITE PRIVATE LIMITED 825000.0 Active 11/05/2004 - U26101RJ2000PTC016601 SUKH SAGAR BUILDCON PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 08/07/2004 - U45201RJ1993PTC007495 BARDIYA CONSTRUCTION COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 49350000.0 Active 13/04/2006 - U45201RJ2000PTC016608 GARG BUILDCON PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 04/09/2000 - U45201RJ2000PTC016698 PRATIK PREMISES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 19/10/2000 - U45201RJ2000PTC016699 AGRASEN PREMISES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 19/10/2000 - U45201RJ2008PTC026160 PRECIOUS PRIME CONSTRUCTION PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/08/2008 - U70101RJ1992PTC006888 KINETIC PROPERTIES PVT. LTD 457000.0 Active 12/01/1998 - U70181RJ2001PTC017152 GUNAWATA FARMS AND PLANTATIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/08/2001 - -
Associated with Directors