AJAY KUMAR JAIN
-
About AJAY KUMAR JAIN,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01403CT2013PTC001118 NARMADA GRAINTECH PRIVATE LIMITED 5100000.0 Active 21/10/2013 - U15310CT2015PTC001623 FUTURE GRAINTECH PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 12/01/2015 - U27102CT2008PTC020756 VAZRON INDUSTRIES PRIVATE LIMITED 2050000.0 Active 16/07/2008 - U27109CT2003PTC016082 NARMADA IRON AND STEEL PVT LTD. 14875000.0 Active 05/04/2006 - U70101CT2012PTC000587 FORTUNE INFRA SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 116358010.0 Active 28/03/2014 - -
Associated with Directors
ABHISHEK JAIN Director BRIJ MOHAN AGRAWAL Director PAWAN KUMAR AGRAWAL Director