ANUJ GARG
-
About ANUJ GARG,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U15313DL1997PTC089546 VISHWAS FOODS PRIVATE LIMITED 20000000.0 Active 11/04/2013 - U16007HR1997PTC033680 SHIVA KATTHA PRIVATE LIMITED 50000000.0 Active 23/08/1997 - U28910DL2004PLC129444 SUNSTAR PRECISION FORGE LIMITED 437000000.0 Active 27/09/2004 - U74999HR2009PTC039284 V.P.G IMPEX PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 29/03/2016 -