AJAY AGARWAL
-
About AJAY AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U25201RJ1998PTC014623 ADITYA PROPCON PRIVATE LIMITED 18500000.0 Active 23/05/2005 - U45201RJ2005PTC020125 JAIPUR BUILDTECH PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 21/03/2014 - U45201RJ2005PTC020143 SHIVKRIPA BUILDCON PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/03/2014 - U45201RJ2006PTC022245 RAJHANS OVERSEAS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 13/04/2012 - U51109WB2005PTC106933 WALTER VANIJYA (P) LTD. 3675000.0 Active 07/01/2013 - U70200WB2004PTC098889 ADISHWAR NIRMAN PRIVATE LIMITED 2742000.0 Active 02/03/2010 - -
Associated with Directors