ASHOK AGARWAL
-
About ASHOK AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U15141RJ1993PTC007220 UMA BUILDESTATE PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 11/08/2004 - U24302RJ1995PLC009738 SUMANGAL AIRWAYS LIMITED 508000.0 Active 23/03/1995 - U25201RJ1998PTC014623 ADITYA PROPCON PRIVATE LIMITED 18500000.0 Active 23/05/2005 - U45201RJ2006PTC022335 COSMOS BUILDHOME PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/11/2006 - U51109RJ2004PTC019905 MAYUR COMMEX PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/12/2005 - U80302RJ2007PTC024986 RAMA FLYING ACADEMY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 12/09/2007 - -
Associated with Directors