ASHOK KUMAR AGARWAL
-
About ASHOK KUMAR AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U16009WB2008PTC127582 TORSA COMMOTRADE PRIVATE LIMITED 29975000.0 Active 01/04/2010 - U45400WB2007PTC115248 SURAJ BUILDCON PRIVATE LIMITED 13545000.0 Active 05/08/2011 - U45400WB2010PTC155000 TIRUPATI FOUNDATION PRIVATE LIMITED 30400000.0 Active 01/12/2010 - U51909WB2009PTC137630 PYRAMID COMOOSALES PRIVATE LIMITED 494400.0 Active 01/05/2011 - U70109WB2011PTC164218 KAMAKHYA INFRAREALTY PRIVATE LIMITED 12600000.0 Active 25/06/2011 -