ASHOK KUMAR M LULLA
-
About ASHOK KUMAR M LULLA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U27100DL2011PTC214689 GLOBUS STEEL & POWER PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 29/05/2014 - U32109HP2000PTC023367 HIMALAYAN CREST POWER PRIVATE LIMITED 114200000.0 Active 12/07/2010 - U40101DL1999PTC101362 SASI POWER PRIVATE LIMITED 59265000.0 Active 12/07/2010 - U40102RJ2007PTC043170 PRAKRITI POWER PRIVATE LIMITED 18300000.0 Active 19/05/2011 - U40103DL2016FTC292329 FOCAL S&B ENERGY INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 106380.0 Active 10/03/2016 - U40106DL2012PTC231814 FOCAL ENERGY SOLAR INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 18413560.0 Active 21/02/2012 - U40106DL2017FTC323690 FOCAL ENERGY POWER DEVELOPMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 14/09/2017 - U40300DL2014FTC265625 FOCAL ENERGY SOLAR ONE INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 19607820.0 Active 28/02/2014 - U40300DL2014PTC268769 FOCAL SOLAR POWER PROJECT PRIVATE LIMITED 196080.0 Active 12/08/2016 - U51909DL1996PTC082891 ALWAR POWER COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 600000.0 Active 18/01/2012 - U74140DL2010PTC258556 SUNBORNE ENERGY RAJASTHAN SOLAR PRIVATE LIMITED 437800.0 Active 22/02/2017 -