ASHOK TIKAMDAS KUKREJA
-
About ASHOK TIKAMDAS KUKREJA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L45200MH1939PLC002958 MODERN SHARES AND STOCKBROKERS LIMITED 29311250.0 Active 18/02/2015 - L74999MH1919PLC000557 BOMBAY CYCLE AND MOTOR AGENCY LIMITED 2000000.0 Active 13/02/2015 - U55200MH1989PTC053770 HILTON RESORTS P LTD 100000.0 Amalgamated 05/10/1989 - U65910MH1989PTC053768 PIERRE CARDIN HOLDINGS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Amalgamated 05/10/1989 - U67120MH1993PLC073185 INDSEC SECURITIES AND FINANCE LTD 359752450.0 Active 13/08/2007 - U99999MH1987PTC045290 JAGRUTI INVESTMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Amalgamated 13/11/1987 - U99999MH1989PTC053760 DONGRE HOLDINGS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Amalgamated 14/11/1989 - U99999MH1991PTC059862 MUSCARI WINERIES AND DISTILLERIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Amalgamated 17/01/1991 - -
Associated with Directors