AJAY KUMAR ARORA
-
About AJAY KUMAR ARORA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01115MP1997PLC012146 SOM AGRO PRODUCTS LIMITED 507000.0 Active 21/07/1997 - U15531MP1993PTC007633 LEGEND DISTILLERIES PVT LTD 32371000.0 Active 15/04/1993 - U40108MP1996PLC010567 SOM POWER LIMITED 13007000.0 Active 14/03/1996 - U45400DL2007PTC169885 ARYAVRAT PROJECTS AND DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 50000000.0 Active 25/10/2007 - U65910MP2010PTC024106 ARYAVRAT FINCON PRIVATE LIMITED 15100000.0 Active 11/08/2010 - U67120MP1995PTC009455 LEGEND CAPITAL PVT LTD 4633000.0 Active 18/05/1995 - -
Associated with Directors
JAGDISH KUMAR ARORA Director SATISH CHANDRA CHATURVEDI Director PRAMOD PRIYA DARSHI Director