AJEET MADHUKAR MULAY
-
About AJEET MADHUKAR MULAY,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01100MH1998PTC113060 GALAXY GOLD AGRO PRIVATE LIMITED 1550000.0 Active 30/01/2008 - U01111MH2011PTC212527 TANUSHRIGOLD FARMS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 19/01/2011 - U15147MH2001PTC132200 GREEN GOLD SEEDS PRIVATE LIMITED 23085000.0 Active 01/06/2001 - U45200MH1991PTC060238 MULAY BROTHERS PRIVATE LIMITED 25040000.0 Active 01/07/2000 - U45200MH2009PTC193206 NIRMANGOLD STRUCTURES PRIVATE LIMITED 22681460.0 Active 10/06/2009 - U72300MH2007PTC175241 SANYA INFOTECH PRIVATE LIMITED 4500000.0 Active 22/10/2007 - U74999MH2013PTC242488 NIRMANGOLD REFLECTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 25/04/2013 -