AJAY AGARWAL
-
About AJAY AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U27100WB2007PTC115906 SINGHAL STEEL PRIVATE LIMITED 3695000.0 Active 18/05/2007 - U27100WB2008PTC126902 SINGHAL STEEL & POWER PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 25/06/2008 - U27106WB2007PTC115907 SINGHAL ALLOYS ISPAT PRIVATE LIMITED 3485000.0 Active 18/05/2007 - U28931CT1991PTC006418 SHRI SHYAM ISPAT(INDIA) PRIVATE LIMITED 83782000.0 Active 27/04/2009 - U40106WB2007PTC115193 SINGHAL ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 19650000.0 Active 16/04/2007 - U45203WB2007PTC115905 S. A. ENCLAVE PRIVATE LIMITED 2420000.0 Active 18/05/2007 - U51909WB1990PTC049193 SHEILY FISCAL SERVICES PVT LTD 10410800.0 Active 01/09/2008 - U52110WB1997PTC082924 SINGHAL ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED 20643000.0 Active 17/07/2001 - U65999WB1995PTC067721 SUKANYA TRADING & FINANCE PRIVATE LIMITED 28619700.0 Active 05/06/2006 - U65999WB1996PTC081996 BSJ FINANCIAL SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 19520000.0 Active 30/05/2007 - -
Associated with Directors