ASHOK KUMAR BUBNA
-
About ASHOK KUMAR BUBNA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45400WB2007PTC114961 RESPECT ABASAN PRIVATE LIMITED 600000.0 Active 08/12/2011 - U45400WB2007PTC115914 JUSTIFY NIRMAN PRIVATE LIMITED 2007450.0 Active 28/05/2007 - U45400WB2007PTC118176 AKB TOWERS PRIVATE LIMITED 2054000.0 Active 29/08/2007 - U51109WB1995PTC070579 JALARAM VINCOM PVT. LTD. 677250.0 Active 23/06/2006 - U51909WB1992PTC056635 PANCHANAN TRADING PVT LTD 2641000.0 Active 10/12/1996 - U70100WB2008PTC125853 JAGDAMBA PROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED 341250.0 Active 19/05/2008 - U74140WB1995PTC070461 RANKINI TRADERS PVT. LTD. 8604840.0 Active 13/04/1995 - -
Associated with Directors
ASHOK KUMAR SINGH Director SRIDHER SHARMA Director CHANDRAKANTA DAS Director MAAN VARDHAN BAID Director