ASHOK JAGDISHNARAIN AGARWAL
-
About ASHOK JAGDISHNARAIN AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U24231MH1988PLC193588 AGARWAL INFRATECH LIMITED. 15453600.0 Active 31/07/1989 - U45200MH1979PTC021954 PARAM ANAND BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 302500.0 Active 31/07/1989 - U45200MH1990PTC058148 ROHAN ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 150060.0 Active 31/12/1991 - U45200MH1990PTC058448 ROHAN PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 08/10/1990 - U70101MH1990PTC058447 SALOONI ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/10/1990 - U74900MH1984PTC033865 AGARWAL HOSPITALITY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000000.0 Active 28/08/1984 - U80301GJ2007NPL050134 VEEHAN EDUCATION FOUNDATION 100000.0 Active 01/03/2007 - U80902MH1990PTC058530 INDIAN INSTITUTE OF VOCATIONAL TRAINING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/10/1990 - U99999MH1979PTC021659 ASHISH BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 1200400.0 Amalgamated 05/09/1979 - -
Associated with Directors