ASHISH AGARWAL
-
About ASHISH AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01403MH2007PTC175375 DWARKA FARMS PRIVATE LIMITED. 100000.0 Active 06/06/2016 - U45202MH2008PTC180525 EQUINOX REALTY & INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 25386100.0 Active 06/06/2016 - U45400MH2007PTC175377 SAMARJIT REALTIES & FARMS PRIVATE LIMITED. 10100000.0 Active 06/06/2016 - U51109WB1996PTC076355 SNOW WHITE AGENCIES PVT LTD 11872000.0 Active 10/09/2016 - U51909AS1998PTC005470 NANOTECH PRIVATE LIMITED 3049800.0 Active 01/02/2002 - U65990MH1978PTC020383 THAKKARS INVESTMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 50000.0 Active 06/06/2016 - U67190TN1972FLC031512 RUPA INVESTMENTS LIMITED 777200.0 Active 07/06/2016 - U70101MH1989PTC051821 KIRTI PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 719000.0 Active 06/06/2016 - U70102MH2007PTC172950 EQUINOX BUSINESS PARKS PRIVATE LIMITED 8999970.0 Active 06/06/2016 - U70102MH2008PTC179530 DWARKA REALTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 06/06/2016 - -
Associated with Directors