AYUSH GUPTA
-
About AYUSH GUPTA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U13209MH2006PTC166297 CHIRON METCO PRIVATE LIMITED 8130000.0 Active 18/12/2006 - U25200MP2010PTC024551 DAKSHA POLYMERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 29/08/2015 - U45309MP2004PTC016357 VINO INFRATECH PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/09/2006 - U51900MH1998PTC160561 ANITAS EXPORTS PRIVATE LIMITED 4100000.0 Active 14/10/2016 - U63090MP1994PTC008037 PARENTERAL COMMERCIAL SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 100200.0 Active 01/09/2014 - U67120MH2005PTC158393 MAHAGANPATI INVESTMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/09/2014 - -
Associated with Directors
ARUNA BAI GUPTA Director ABHAY GUPTA Director SHASHI GARG Director MANISH GARG Director ASHISH GARG Director