ASHOK KUMAR MITTAL
-
About ASHOK KUMAR MITTAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U25209WB2003PTC097164 SUNRISE PLASTICS (I) PRIVATE LIMITED 5402400.0 Amalgamated 20/05/2011 - U27109WB2004PTC099558 MITTAL SMELTER PRIVATE LIMITED 1600000.0 Active 25/08/2004 - U45400WB2010PTC155991 MEADOW HOUSING PRIVATE LIMITED 10500000.0 Active 20/12/2010 - U51109WB1995PTC067779 CRON GOODS & SUPPLY PVT.LTD. 19760000.0 Amalgamated 20/05/2011 - U51109WB2005PTC105680 SHEETAL DEALERS PRIVATE LIMITED 27560000.0 Amalgamated 28/07/2011 - U70101WB2007NPL118216 RUKMANI PARASMANI FLAT HOLDERS ASSOCIATION 81500.0 Active 03/01/2016 - U93030WB2010PTC148545 M.A. ADVISORY SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 19/05/2010 - -
Associated with Directors