ATUL LADHA
-
About ATUL LADHA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U02101MP1997PTC011548 SHRI CHAKRADHAR PAPERS AND BOARDS PRIVATE LIMITED 4547000.0 Active 30/07/2011 - U15311MP1997PTC011871 SUNRISE TANKS PRIVATE LIMITED 14316990.0 Active 14/01/2001 - U25200MP2011PTC026898 VECTUS CONTAINERS PRIVATE LIMITED 6500000.0 Active 07/10/2011 - U25202MP1990PTC006033 SINTIR PLAST CONTAINERS PRIVATE LIMITED 5000000.0 Amalgamated 24/05/2002 - U25202MP1998PTC012849 GANGOTRI POLYMERS PRIVATE LIMITED 2998660.0 Active 29/05/1998 - U25202MP2000PTC014017 WATERWELL CONTAINERS PRIVATE LIMITED 2000000.0 Amalgamated 01/10/2002 - U25202MP2007PLC019781 VECTUS INDUSTRIES LIMITED 131468290.0 Active 30/08/2007 - U25206MP2007PTC019335 WATERWELL MOULDINGS PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Amalgamated 07/03/2007 - U28122MP1995PTC009786 SHIVANGI POLYMERS PVT LTD 1000000.0 Active 14/07/2014 - U51494MP2006PTC018473 VIDHYA SAGAR DHODY MARKETING PRIVATE LIMITED 800000.0 Active 11/08/2009 - U70100MP2008PTC020293 LADHA REAL ESTATE PRIVATE LIMITED 2500000.0 Active 05/02/2008 - U91100MP2015NPL033812 GWALIOR CHAMBAL FEDERATION OF INDUSTRIES 0.0 Active 09/02/2015 - -
Associated with Directors