ASHISH OMPRAKASH MANTRI
-
About ASHISH OMPRAKASH MANTRI,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01403MH2012PTC232049 KRISHI I-DAL PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 04/03/2017 - U15122MH2013PTC242769 ABHAY NATURAL SUGARS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/05/2013 - U17121MH2008PTC182247 ABHAY NUTRITION PRIVATE LIMITED 67042680.0 Active 15/05/2008 - U17233MH2007PTC171768 VRISHABH COTTON PRIVATE LIMITED 12500000.0 Active 18/06/2007 - U67120MH2000PTC124776 ADINATH STOCK BROKING PRIVATE LIMITED 23100000.0 Active 19/03/2000 - U72200MH1995PTC084944 RUSHABHDEV COMMODITIES BROKING PRIVATE LIMITED 5500000.0 Active 23/10/2003 - U80900MH2010NPL198574 RISHI VIDYA EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION 1543000.0 Active 06/01/2010 - -
Associated with Directors