ASHISH SHAMRAO PEDNEKAR
-
About ASHISH SHAMRAO PEDNEKAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01100MH2004PTC145576 NHAVA SHEVA CFS AND AGRI PARK PRIVATE LIMITED 563640.0 Active 01/04/2006 - U63090MH1984NPL034904 BRIHANMUMBAI CUSTOM BROKERS ASSOCIATION 0.0 Active 12/09/2012 - U63090MH2007PTC173473 GVP FORWARDER PRIVATE LIMITED 6600000.0 Active 27/08/2007 - U74900MH2012PTC234820 SIDDHIVINAYAK TRANSPORT AND LOGISTICS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/08/2012 - -
Associated with Directors