AKHILA SRINIVASAN
-
About AKHILA SRINIVASAN,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45201TN1995PLC033214 SHRIRAM PROPERTIES AND CONSTRUCTIONS (CHENNAI) LIMITED 24999800.0 Active 01/03/1998 - U65993TN1974PLC006588 SHRIRAM CAPITAL LIMITED 1074413131.0 Active 18/02/2014 - U66010RJ2006PLC029979 SHRIRAM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY LIMITED 2587380000.0 Active 02/02/2015 - U66010TG2005PLC045616 SHRIRAM LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY LIMITED 1793750000.0 Active 25/11/2005 - U67200TN2006PTC058644 SHRIRAM RETAIL HOLDINGS PRIVATE LIMITED 45215820.0 Amalgamated 24/01/2006 - U72200TN2000PTC044605 SHRIRAM CENTRE FOR LEARNING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 02/01/2003 - U85100TN2015NPL099240 SHRIRAM SEVA SANKALP FOUNDATION 1000000.0 Active 13/02/2015 - -
Associated with Directors