ASHA GARG
-
About ASHA GARG,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45400UP2010PTC042377 PROPITIOUS CONSTRUCTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 400000.0 Active 25/10/2010 - U70100UP2013PTC061342 EIFFEL INFRADEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/12/2013 - U70102UP2011PTC047758 ULTIMATE INFRAVENTURES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 02/01/2015 - U70102UP2011PTC047760 STAMEN REALTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 07/12/2011 - U70102UP2011PTC047761 JADE NIRMAN PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 19/08/2015 - U70102UP2012PTC053437 LEKH INFRABUILD PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 21/12/2013 - U70102UP2012PTC053438 D & G BUILDCON PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 21/12/2013 - U70102UP2012PTC053637 STANCE CONSTRUCTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 19/08/2015 - U70102UP2012PTC053695 JALSA CONSTRUCTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 19/08/2015 - U74899DL1981PTC142167 S K GARG CONSTRUCTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED. 10000000.0 Active 04/12/2003 - U92412UP2011PTC045034 EIFFEL RECREATION CLUB PRIVATE LIMITED 30000000.0 Active 30/05/2011 -