AAYUSH GOENKA
-
About AAYUSH GOENKA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U17309DL1995PLC070398 SONAL INTERTREND LIMITED 41716250.0 Active 03/07/1995 - U27109DL1980PTC010559 KALINDI BRIGHT STEELS AND TUBES PRIVATE LIMITED 17776000.0 Active 18/06/1980 - U51909DL1984PLC018740 YASH GLOBAL LIMITED 615070.0 Active 01/02/2008 - U67120DL2010PTC210021 KARMA HOLDINGS PRIVATE LIMITED 150000.0 Active 02/04/2015 - U74994DL2007PLC164774 CALZINI FASHIONS LIMITED 22575000.0 Active 14/06/2007 -