ASHOK JHAWAR KUMAR
-
About ASHOK JHAWAR KUMAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U24230MH1985PTC036752 NIREN DRUGS AND PHARMACEUTICALS PVT LTD 100000.0 Active 18/09/1992 - U51900MH2000PTC126113 SWABHIMAN MARKETING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 06/10/2001 - U51909WB1995PTC075510 ANGLES TRADING PVT LTD 15381100.0 Active 16/06/2010 - U67120MH1991PTC064366 GROW CLOCK INVESTMENTS PVT LTD 20015000.0 Active 10/12/1991 - U67190MH1990PTC058336 MOHAN FISCAL SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Active 27/09/1990 - -
Associated with Directors
PUSHPA JHAWAR Director MOHAN JHAWAR Director SAURAV JHANWAR Director ANIL KUMAR JHAWAR Director