ALOK RUNGTA
-
About ALOK RUNGTA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U10300WB2015PTC204908 ARAANYA MINES PRIVATE LIMITED 70000000.0 Active 12/01/2015 - U26941JH2004PTC010665 MAA CHHINNMASTIKA CEMENT AND ISPAT PRIVATE LIMITED 173296400.0 Active 05/12/2014 - U29246WB1989PTC047741 VIKASH FASTNERS PVT LTD 16920760.0 Active 17/05/2010 - U45400WB2008PTC129137 PALAK PROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED 3605500.0 Active 28/05/2009 - U51109WB1994PTC063901 LUPIN COMMODEAL PVT. LTD. 31027700.0 Active 03/04/2010 - U51109WB1994PTC066679 RIMZIM MERCHANTS PVT. LTD. 8068370.0 Active 17/05/2010 - U51909WB1991PTC051710 NAGINA EXPORTS & FINVEST PVT LTD 22717760.0 Active 03/04/2010 - U51909WB1996PTC078723 ESCORTS TRADELINK PVT LTD 24508300.0 Active 03/04/2010 - U65191WB1995PTC074043 TOLASARIYA VINIYOG PVT LTD 25949330.0 Active 03/04/2010 - U70200WB2010PTC143120 FUSION INFRADEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 2900000.0 Active 03/07/2017 - -
Associated with Directors
ABHISHEK RUNGTA Director PARSURAM SINGH Director MAYA RUNGTA Director ASHISH RUNGTA Director