AJAY RAJENDRAPRASAD SHUKLA
-
About AJAY RAJENDRAPRASAD SHUKLA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U25190MH2013PTC240959 3D-SEALS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 14/03/2013 - U25199MH2010PTC208819 AIS GUMMITECH APAC PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 10/10/2010 - U28990MH2007PTC171913 SEALMART INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 465000.0 Active 22/06/2007 - U92190MH2012PTC234226 3D-MEDIA HOUSE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 06/08/2012 - -
Associated with Directors
POOJA AJAY SHUKLA Director