ASHOK BALASAHEB GAJBAR
-
About ASHOK BALASAHEB GAJBAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U55101PN2005PTC020668 SHAILA CLUBS AND RESORTS PRIVATE LIMITED 27000000.0 Active 08/02/2011 - U67100MH2008PTC177247 ASHA FINANCIAL CONSULTANCY SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 5000000.0 Active 02/01/2008 - U74140MH2008PTC177457 VIAS ADVISORY SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 07/01/2008 - U85191MH2011PTC217779 TRUE KARE HOSPITALS INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 23/05/2011 -