ANITA AGARWAL
-
About ANITA AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U27109WB1982PTC035491 SHYAM SUNDAR CASTING PRIVATE LIMITED 2196800.0 Active 21/12/2000 - U27109WB1999PTC090657 SATYAMAN ENGINEERING PRIVATE LIMITED 1470000.0 Active 10/02/2014 - U31900WB2007PTC120875 AEW AUTOMATIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 22/04/2015 - U45400WB2014PTC204657 ANISAT INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 26/12/2014 - -
Associated with Directors
AMAN AGARWAL Director GAZEL AGARWAL Director PRABIR KUMAR BANERJEE Director PAWAN KUMAR THAKUR Director