ARUN VINOD NAYAR
-
About ARUN VINOD NAYAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U51900MH1988PTC049137 NAYAR BUSINESS CENTRE PRIVATE LIMITED 300000.0 Active 14/06/1999 - U51900MH1989PTC053220 HOLLY TRADERS PRIVATE LIMITED 470000.0 Active 18/01/1993 - U70102MH2012PTC226068 NAYAR GREENFIELD PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 14/01/2012 - U72900MH2007PTC170523 NEOTERIS TECHNOLOGIES & CONSULTING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 20/02/2008 - U74990MH2010PTC205400 TOTAL QUALITY SOLUTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 150000.0 Converted to LLP and Dissolved 12/07/2010 - U74999MH2016PTC272206 KARHOO TECHNOLOGIES INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/01/2016 - U92412MH2007PTC177108 FROZEN DIGIT TECHNOLOGIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/12/2007 - -
Associated with Directors
NIKHIL VINOD NAYAR Director GUNHILD NAYAR Director ASHA KUTTY SHETTY Director SANJAY CHANDER GUPTA Director