ASHOK KUMAR SINGH
-
About ASHOK KUMAR SINGH,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U00318BR1997PTC008033 JAI MANGALA FUELS PRIVATE LIMITED 2957800.0 Active 16/07/1997 - U01119BR2013PTC020583 GYAN BUDDHA AGRO INDUSTRIES PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Active 28/06/2013 - U08011BR1996PLC007355 BASANT VANIJYA LIMITED 640000.0 Active 21/08/2000 - U23100BR1991PTC004508 GAYA COKE COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 4533800.0 Active 26/06/1991 - U55101BR2011PTC016466 GYAN BUDDHA REGENCY PRIVATE LIMITED 150000.0 Active 20/01/2011 - U55101BR2011PTC017409 F3 HOSPITALITY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 02/09/2011 -