ABHIJIT HAZARIKA
-
About ABHIJIT HAZARIKA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U65990AS2015PTC012057 AYURSUNDRA HOLDINGS (INDIA) PRIVATE LIMITED 64547290.0 Active 12/03/2015 - U85110AS2007PTC008546 AYURSUNDRA HEALTH CARE PRIVATE LIMITED 304651910.0 Active 28/12/2007 - U85110AS2013PTC011648 AYURSUNDRA ONCOLOGY (GUWAHATI) PRIVATE LIMITED 32100000.0 Active 09/09/2013 - U85195AS2013PTC011633 AYURSUNDRA ONCOLOGY (INDIA) PRIVATE LIMITED 222030.0 Active 26/08/2013 - -
Associated with Directors
SIMANTA DAS Director LAKSHI BAISHYA Director HIMADRI SHANKAR BARTHAKUR Director BALWANT SINGH Director