ARUN MADHAV MARUPURU
-
About ARUN MADHAV MARUPURU,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01119TG2010PTC067986 MARUPURU BIOTEK PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Converted to LLP 19/04/2010 - U01119TG2010PTC068271 LOTUS CULTIVATION INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Converted to LLP 05/05/2010 - U01119TG2010PTC068399 CLASSIC AGRO ENGINEERING INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 12/05/2010 - U01222KA2011PTC057433 LOTUS BREEDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/10/2015 - U15339KA2009PTC048932 LOTUS BIOVET INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/10/2015 - U73100TG2010PTC068349 MVR RESEARCH AND BREEDING FARMS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Converted to LLP 10/05/2010 - U74900TG2009PTC066149 LOTUS PETCARE INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 04/12/2009 - -
Associated with Directors
DAMODAR REDDY MARUPURU Director SUREKHA MARUPURU Director SRIHARI REDDY MANGALAPURU Director