AJAY KAZA
-
About AJAY KAZA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U31401TG2008PTC057346 ECI INFRA TOWERS COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000000.0 Active 12/02/2009 - U40101TG2006PTC062948 HAYEN HYDEL POWER COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 150000000.0 Active 14/11/2009 - U40101TG2012PTC084007 TURU HYDRO ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 06/11/2012 - U40102TG2008PTC061447 RUPA HYDEL POWER PRIVATE LIMITED 112100000.0 Active 17/10/2008 - U45200TG1994PLC016827 ECI ENGINEERING AND CONSTRUCTION COMPANY LTD 146398090.0 Active 01/12/2001 - -
Associated with Directors