AJAY KUMAR AGARWAL
-
About AJAY KUMAR AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U52311UP2004PTC029379 B.N.RAJ INFRATECH PRIVATE LIMITED 7600000.0 Active 26/07/2017 - U70100UP2013PTC060451 GPL HOUSING PRIVATE LIMITED 6100000.0 Active 12/12/2016 - U70102UP2011PTC045494 S. G. S. G. INFRA RENTALS PRIVATE LIMITED 150000.0 Active 30/12/2017 - U70102UP2011PTC047789 BASANT INFRACON PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 31/03/2016 - U70102UP2013PTC058283 PRABHU INFRADEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 28/06/2017 - -
Associated with Directors
AMIT SHUKLA Director ANUBHAV AGARWAL Director