ARCHNA SHARMA
-
About ARCHNA SHARMA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U55101MH2017PTC297381 SETRAC HOSPITALITY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 14/07/2017 - U70102MH2011PTC223582 MAX GREEN FIELDS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 02/11/2011 - U70102MH2011PTC223947 NIKI GREENFIELD PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/11/2011 - U70102MH2011PTC224052 SAM GREEN FIELDS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/11/2011 - U74990MH2009PTC191206 SEAFARERS TRAINING & CAREERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 24/03/2009 - U80301MH2010NPL205299 SETRAC MARITIME TRAINING & WELFARE ORGANISATION 100000.0 Active 06/07/2010 - -
Associated with Directors
AJAY KUMAR Director NIKHIL VINOD NAYAR Director PERCY BOMI VASUNIA Director KAMLA SHARMA Director