AMRITA GARG
-
About AMRITA GARG,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U08519MP2003NPL016228 HERBS AND HERBALS EXPORT PROMOTION ASSOCIATION OF INDIA 48000.0 Active 30/03/2007 - U52311MP1997PLC011825 KUBER IMPEX LIMITED 2000000.0 Active 22/06/2007 - U70101MP2010PLC024373 G S REAL ESTATE & ALLIED LIMITED 500000.0 Active 20/03/2011 - U70101MP2013PTC030746 K.R.S. INFRA-ESTATE PROJECT DEVELOPER PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 16/05/2013 - U73100MP2003NPL016211 PULSE DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATION OF INDIA 44000.0 Active 30/03/2007 - U92190MP2007PTC019768 SHEHNAI CLUB AND RESORTS PRIVATE LIMITED 5000000.0 Active 09/08/2011 - -
Associated with Directors
KAPIL GARG Director JATAN KUMAR GARG Director SUDHIR JAIN Director SUNITA JAIN Director