AYUSH JAIN
-
About AYUSH JAIN,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U17291JK2013PTC004063 KASHMIR WOOL & SILK TEXTILE PARK PRIVATE LIMITED 2820000.0 Active 04/12/2013 - U17291JK2015PTC004317 KASHMIR WOVENSACKS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 03/02/2015 - U25200JK2015PTC004318 KASHMIR POLYPACK PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 04/02/2015 - U25200JK2015PTC004319 KASHMIR PROPACK PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 04/02/2015 - U72200DL1998PTC092554 REVEL OVERSEAS PRIVATE LIMITED 32420200.0 Active 01/04/2009 - -
Associated with Directors
KUSH AGGARWAL Director RAJESH KUMAR Director SURAJ SHARMA PRAKASH Director