ARUN KUMAR MEHTA
-
About ARUN KUMAR MEHTA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U40101JK2013SGC003818 JAMMU AND KASHMIR STATE POWER TRANSMISSION COMPANY LIMITED 500000.0 Active 25/03/2013 - U40101JK2013SGC003820 JAMMU AND KASHMIR STATE POWER TRADING COMPANY LIMITED 500000.0 Active 26/03/2013 - U40300JK2013SGC003898 JAMMU POWER DISTRIBUTION COMPANY LIMITED 500000.0 Active 03/06/2013 - U40300JK2013SGC003915 KASHMIR POWER DISTRIBUTION COMPANY LIMITED 500000.0 Active 26/06/2013 - -
Associated with Directors
BHARAT BUSHAN VYAS Director ASGAR ALI MAJAZ Director SURESH KUMAR Director