ATIKA GOYAL
-
About ATIKA GOYAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01409DL2012PTC238073 SIRSA FARMS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 26/06/2012 - U45200DL2012PTC238035 LORDS CITYHOMES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 25/06/2012 - U45400DL2010PTC198695 MDAG CONSTRUCTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 09/04/2015 - U70109DL2015PTC278200 JOYCITY DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/03/2015 - U74300DL2015PTC276132 MULTITV ONLINE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 11/09/2015 - U74899DL1987PTC028461 GOLDEN VIEW HOTEL PRIVATE LTD 205000.0 Active 26/04/2012 - -
Associated with Directors
VIKAS GOYAL Director ANUP GARG Director NARENDRA KUMAR SURANA Director JETHA NAND SALUJA Director