ASHOK KUMAR SHAH
-
About ASHOK KUMAR SHAH,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45400WB2012PTC188328 VEDVANI RESIDENCY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/11/2012 - U45400WB2012PTC188353 SARVLOK HIRISE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 16/11/2012 - U45400WB2012PTC188528 PREMKUNJ RESIDENCY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 22/11/2012 - U45400WB2012PTC188547 TOPMOST COMPLEX PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/11/2012 - -
Associated with Directors
RASHMI GOENKA Director NIRUPAMA BHANIRAMKA Director BIMLA DEVI JALAN Director CHANCHAL BHANIRAMKA Director