AJAY KUMAR JAIN
-
About AJAY KUMAR JAIN,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U51109WB2006PTC109817 RSJ DEALERS PVT LTD 100000.0 Active 22/12/2009 - U51109WB2009PTC135657 KINGSTON TRACOM PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 14/07/2010 - U51909WB2011PTC164297 MIDAS VENTURES PRIVATE LIMITED 2500000.0 Active 11/03/2014 - U65999WB1993PTC059739 K.P. CREDIT & TRADERS PVT. LTD. 14805520.0 Active 30/03/2010 - U74140WB2006PTC109818 ATIKA CONSULTANCY PVT LTD 990000.0 Active 22/12/2009 - -
Associated with Directors
MUKESH SONI Director JHUMJHUM GUHA Director PRABHAT KUMAR KASERA Director BIKASH CHANDRA JANA Director