AJEET GOSWAMI
-
About AJEET GOSWAMI,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U67190UP2007PTC034179 MENTOR INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 04/04/2013 - U70101DL2011PTC219074 RIDER INFRABUILD PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 16/06/2011 - U70109DL2011PTC219096 MINARVA BUILDWELL PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/06/2011 - U70109DL2012PTC234098 MARTEN BUILDWELL PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 11/05/2012 - U70109DL2012PTC234316 MARTEN DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 21/05/2012 - U70109DL2013PTC257246 DESPECTO REALTORS INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 373650.0 Active 04/07/2017 - U70200DL2010PTC206722 CYGNUS BUILDTECH PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 05/08/2010 - U70200DL2012PTC237279 RANCH BUILDWELL PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 24/08/2012 - U74999DL1992PLC048868 SILVER SAND CORPORATION LIMITED 38500000.0 Active 09/10/2017 - -
Associated with Directors
ABHISHEK SINGH Director MOHD ZULQUER NAIN Director KAMAL BHATT Director