AJAY GHOSH
-
About AJAY GHOSH,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U51909WB2009PTC139935 YUTHIKA TRADING COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 71200000.0 Active 18/08/2010 - U51909WB2011PTC168237 PREKSHA TRADECOM PRIVATE LIMITED 49600000.0 Active 28/09/2011 - U67120WB1994PTC066990 IGLOO COMMERCE PVT LTD 70500300.0 Active 02/06/2016 - U71110WB1995PTC073051 ORIENTAL HOLDINGS PRIVATE LIMITED 7975000.0 Active 28/10/2014 - U74140WB2006PTC107794 SQUARE MOON CONSULTANCY PVT. LTD. 2350000.0 Active 15/11/2014 - U74999WB2011PTC168238 TULSI COMMUNICATION PRIVATE LIMITED 42100000.0 Active 28/09/2011 - -
Associated with Directors
SANJAY MALOO Director SURAJIT GOSWAMI Director PRAKASH SARKAR Director UJJAL CHAKRABORTY Director