ARUN KUMAR SHARMA
-
About ARUN KUMAR SHARMA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U70101WB2006PTC111011 KREDENT CONSTRUCTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 2475000.0 Active 17/03/2015 - U70102WB2013PTC194068 SUPERSONIC INFRA INDUSTRIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Amalgamated 31/05/2013 - U70109WB2011PTC165616 BRIGHT HIRISE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Amalgamated 29/07/2011 - U70109WB2011PTC165617 GOLDSHINE DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 29/07/2011 - U70109WB2011PTC165622 SKYTOUCH PLAZZA PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Amalgamated 06/02/2015 - U70109WB2011PTC165722 TRUELINE ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Amalgamated 01/08/2011 - U72200WB2006PTC108920 CUSTOMERS FIRST CALL CENTERS INFO PVT LTD 3000000.0 Active 05/03/2013 - U74999WB2011PTC164521 SBA HOSPITALITY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Amalgamated 06/02/2015 - -
Associated with Directors
BINAY BAJAJ Director RAJIV KYAL Director VIKASH BAJAJ Director PRAKASH SHARMA Director RAJIV TODI Director