AJIT DINKAR DABHOLKAR
-
About AJIT DINKAR DABHOLKAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U29219GJ2012PLC070565 RELIANCE ENGINEERING AND DEFENCE SERVICES LIMITED 500000.0 Active 18/01/2016 - U29241GJ2013PTC077604 RELIANCE LIGHTER THAN AIR SYSTEMS PRIVATE LIMITED 1400000.0 Active 18/01/2016 - U29248MH2013PTC247148 RELIANCE TECHNOLOGIES AND SYSTEMS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/01/2016 - U29253MH2012PTC238456 MAZAGON DOCK PIPAVAV DEFENCE PRIVATE LIMITED 0.0 Active 26/07/2017 - U35100GJ2012PLC070568 RELIANCE MARINE AND OFFSHORE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 29/07/2017 - U63000GJ1995PTC026113 E COMPLEX PRIVATE LIMITED 217093270.0 Active 28/09/2011 - U72900KA2004PTC034151 CONCEPTIA SOFTWARE TECHNOLOGIES PRIVATE LIMITED 4400000.0 Active 06/09/2011 - U75210MH2016PLC273310 RELIANCE CRUISE AND TERMINALS LIMITED 500000.0 Active 18/01/2017 - U75302MH2017PLC301837 RELIANCE ARMAMENTS LIMITED 500000.0 Active 16/11/2017 - U75302MH2017PLC302290 RELIANCE AMMUNITION LIMITED 500000.0 Active 29/11/2017 - -
Associated with Directors