AGARWAL PRAVEEN KUMAR
-
About AGARWAL PRAVEEN KUMAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45400MH2013PTC242770 RJ ADVENTURES & REALTY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 02/05/2013 - U67120MH2013PTC242585 RJ GLOBAL INVESTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 26/04/2013 - U67190MH2013PTC242928 RJ FININVESTMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 04/05/2013 - U74999MH2014PTC257252 RJ MEDIA & ENTERTAINMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/08/2014 - U74999MH2016PTC283252 RJ FUN-O-RAMA PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 05/07/2016 - U92300MH2012PTC238992 RJ FITNESS CLUB PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Active 20/12/2012 - U93000MH2012PTC227878 RJ CAPITAL OVERSEAS PRIVATE LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 09/03/2012 - -
Associated with Directors
VAIBHAV BHARGAVA Director ARUN VISHWESHWAR SHARMA Director SONAL AGARWAL Director SUDHANSHU SHARMA Director