AMRIT LAL SHARMA
-
About AMRIT LAL SHARMA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U51101WB2010PTC149442 DHANVARSHA VINTRADE PRIVATE LIMITED 220000.0 Active 28/03/2016 - U51909WB2010PTC152650 SHIVRATRI SALES PRIVATE LIMITED 819000.0 Active 08/09/2012 - U51909WB2010PTC153832 SUBHDATA DISTRIBUTOR PRIVATE LIMITED 152040.0 Active 06/09/2012 - U51909WB2013PTC191437 WINWELL TRADECOM PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/10/2015 - U70101WB1996PTC081791 GOVIND REALTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 373000.0 Active 26/09/2015 - U70109WB2012PTC176095 RIDDHIMAN INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 2250000.0 Active 08/06/2015 - U74900WB2013PTC190962 DHANKALASH VYAPAAR PRIVATE LIMITED 900000.0 Active 31/03/2014 - U74900WB2013PTC192726 YASHMIT SHOPPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 900000.0 Active 31/03/2014 - U74999WB2010PLC150964 LIP CHAIN MARKETING LIMITED 523600.0 Active 21/02/2015 - -
Associated with Directors
DEVANSH DUGAR Director MAHESH SHARMA Director SHYAM AGARWAL Director MEWA LAL SHARMA Director